NY A09452 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-14 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-14 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide person-centered mental health services work group to improve statewide mental health planning and outcomes to achieve a person-centered, prevention-first integrated and tiered system of care for holistic health and wellness.
Title
Establishes a statewide person-centered mental health services work group to improve statewide mental health planning and outcomes to achieve a person-centered, prevention-first integrated and tiered system of care for holistic health and wellness.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Maritza Davila [D] |
Asm. Monique Chandler-Waterman [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Manny De Los Santos [D] | Asm. Brian Maher [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | print number 9452a |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S08820 (Same As) 2024-05-15 - PRINT NUMBER 8820A