NY A09441 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the appointment and promotion of supervisors of the emergency medical service.
Title
Relates to the appointment and promotion of supervisors of the emergency medical service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.246 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-04-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-04-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.448 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6935 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.463 |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06935 (Same As) 2016-04-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9441