NY A09381 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6692b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6692b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to comprehensive emergency management plans' provisions for homecare and hospice in counties and in cities with a population of one million or more.
Title
Relates to comprehensive emergency management plans' provisions for homecare and hospice in counties and in cities with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s6692b |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.497 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | print number 9381b |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | print number 9381a |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06692 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.279