NY A09360 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - signed chap.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - signed chap.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends expiration of the authority granted to the department of housing preservation and development of the city of New York to restructure the rents of dwelling units in buildings foreclosed upon by the federal government.
Title
Extends expiration of the authority granted to the department of housing preservation and development of the city of New York to restructure the rents of dwelling units in buildings foreclosed upon by the federal government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | signed chap.63 |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-05-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.380 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6878 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.663 |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06878 (Same As) 2014-05-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9360