NY A09323 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of a retail license for on-premises consumption for certain premises in the county of Erie.
Title
Relates to the issuance of a retail license for on-premises consumption for certain premises in the county of Erie.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Senate | signed chap.349 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.891 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7165 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.694 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06825 (Same As) 2016-03-30 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07165 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9323
S07165 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9323