NY A09301 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Rockland to regulate the registration and licensing of taxicabs, limousines, and livery vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Rockland to regulate the registration and licensing of taxicabs, limousines, and livery vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.385
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-13SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2012-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.1117
2012-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6491
2012-06-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-11Assemblyhome rule request
2012-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.111
2012-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.111
2012-06-11Assemblyreported
2012-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-05-15Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-02-15Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S06491 (Same As) 2012-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9301

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback