NY A09280 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - substituted by s8308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - substituted by s8308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in 2022, the statement of party positions to be filled at a primary election shall be filed by February 28, 2022; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Provides that in 2022, the statement of party positions to be filled at a primary election shall be filed by February 28, 2022; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Assembly | substituted by s8308 |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.60 |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S08308 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - SIGNED CHAP.17