NY A09218 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6925
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6925
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of chapter 405 of the laws of 2005 for two years authorizing the county of Albany to impose a county mortgage recording tax.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of chapter 405 of the laws of 2005 for two years authorizing the county of Albany to impose a county mortgage recording tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6925 |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.849 |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06925 (Same As) 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.234