NY A09203 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-12 - print number 9203a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-12 - print number 9203a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes 15-17 year olds to register to donate organs and tissue upon their death; provides that parents or a legal guardian shall be notified and can rescind such decision to donate organs or tissue at the time of death; requires that the parent or legal guardian sign the registration along with the 15-17 year old and that such registration may be submitted by mail, in person, or electronically.
Title
Authorizes 15-17 year olds to register to donate organs and tissue upon their death; provides that parents or a legal guardian shall be notified and can rescind such decision to donate organs or tissue at the time of death; requires that the parent or legal guardian sign the registration along with the 15-17 year old and that such registration may be submitted by mail, in person, or electronically.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Barbara Clark [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Assembly | print number 9203a |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-03-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02052 (Same As) 2014-05-09 - PRINT NUMBER 2052A