NY A09197 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - substituted by s6395a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - substituted by s6395a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the board of directors of domestic life insurance companies.
Title
Relates to the board of directors of domestic life insurance companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Assembly | substituted by s6395a |
2016-02-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.406 |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06395 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - SIGNED CHAP.8