NY A09191 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the Tier II provisions to all police officers and firefighters who join a public retirement system on or after July 1, 2009 and prior to July 1, 2011.
Title
Extends the Tier II provisions to all police officers and firefighters who join a public retirement system on or after July 1, 2009 and prior to July 1, 2011.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Alessi [D] | Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D] | Asm. Sam Hoyt [D] | Asm. Rory Lancman [D] |
Asm. Michael Spano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | enacting clause stricken | |
2010-01-06 | referred to governmental employees | |
2009-10-13 | referred to governmental employees |