NY A09175 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - substituted by s6379a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - substituted by s6379a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to liability of shareholders for wages due to laborers, servants or employees for certain foreign corporations.
Title
Relates to liability of shareholders for wages due to laborers, servants or employees for certain foreign corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Assembly | substituted by s6379a |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.385 |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06379 (Same As) 2016-03-08 - SIGNED CHAP.5