NY A09170 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires assessment-rolls to be published and searchable on the department of finance website.
Title
Requires assessment-rolls to be published and searchable on the department of finance website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | tabled |
2014-11-21 | Senate | vetoed memo.501 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1412 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7473 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.658 |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07473 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9170