NY A09157 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.384
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the right of vested members to withdraw from the New York city teachers' retirement system; allows a member who has permanently ceased teaching in New York to elect to withdraw his/her accumulated contributions to enable the member to obtain credit for the teaching service in another state provided such member has at least five years of service credit in that system, and the withdrawal must be necessary in order for the member to obtain credit in the other system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the right of vested members to withdraw from the New York city teachers' retirement system; allows a member who has permanently ceased teaching in New York to elect to withdraw his/her accumulated contributions to enable the member to obtain credit for the teaching service in another state provided such member has at least five years of service credit in that system, and the withdrawal must be necessary in order for the member to obtain credit in the other system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.384
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1464
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6224A
2012-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.301
2012-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.301
2012-06-18Assemblyreported
2012-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-05-31Assemblyprint number 9157a
2012-05-31Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2012-01-31Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S06224 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9157A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback