NY A09137 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - substituted by s8789
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - substituted by s8789
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the city of New Rochelle to impose an occupancy tax until September 1, 2027.
Title
Extends the authority of the city of New Rochelle to impose an occupancy tax until September 1, 2027.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s8789 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.186 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.186 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08789 (Same As) 2024-08-28 - SIGNED CHAP.277