NY A09116 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the village of Port Chester occupancy tax until December 31, 2025.
Title
Extends the village of Port Chester occupancy tax until December 31, 2025.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Assembly | signed chap.411 |
2022-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.955 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8041 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.338 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.338 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08041 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9116