NY A09096 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - defeated in health
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - defeated in health
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the display of tobacco products in pharmacies.
Title
Relates to the display of tobacco products in pharmacies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Assembly | defeated in health |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | print number 9096a |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07106 (Same As) 2014-04-28 - REFERRED TO HEALTH