NY A09061 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - signed chap.36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - signed chap.36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the detention of individuals who are eighteen years of age or older in a county jail pending a first court appearance in an off-hours arraignment part.
Title
Permits the detention of individuals who are eighteen years of age or older in a county jail pending a first court appearance in an off-hours arraignment part.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Senate | signed chap.36 |
2020-04-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-02-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.87 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7163 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.381 |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S07163 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - signed chap.36