NY A09059 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that every motor carrier shall furnish the department of motor vehicles a list of each altered motor vehicle commonly referred to as a "stretch limousine" designed to carry 9 or more passengers; requires the commissioner of motor vehicles to annually review the bus driver files of each driver employed by a motor vehicle carrier who operates such stretch limousine; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that every motor carrier shall furnish the department of motor vehicles a list of each altered motor vehicle commonly referred to as a "stretch limousine" designed to carry 9 or more passengers; requires the commissioner of motor vehicles to annually review the bus driver files of each driver employed by a motor vehicle carrier who operates such stretch limousine; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | signed chap.12 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.82 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6604B |
2020-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.9 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.9 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06604 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - signed chap.12