NY A09018 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes licensed creative arts therapists to bill Medicaid directly for their services.
Title
Authorizes licensed creative arts therapists to bill Medicaid directly for their services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1852 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8715 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.261 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.261 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08715 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9018