NY A08957 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - substituted by s6672a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - substituted by s6672a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of financial assistance to establish a public awareness program on the availability of long term health care insurance, the financing thereof and the provision of tax credits for premiums paid therefor; accelerates payment of death benefits and special surrender values upon receipt of the insured of end of life or palliative care.
Title
Directs the department of financial assistance to establish a public awareness program on the availability of long term health care insurance, the financing thereof and the provision of tax credits for premiums paid therefor; accelerates payment of death benefits and special surrender values upon receipt of the insured of end of life or palliative care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s6672a |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.286 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.286 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | print number 8957a |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06672 (Same As) 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.465