NY A08946 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-16 - signed chap.22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-16 - signed chap.22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to changing the amount of members the African-American History Commission consists of, extends the deadline for when the commission should submit reports of its findings, and extends the repeal date for when the commission shall cease to exist.
Title
Relates to changing the amount of members the African-American History Commission consists of, extends the deadline for when the commission should submit reports of its findings, and extends the repeal date for when the commission shall cease to exist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-16 | Senate | signed chap.22 |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.27 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6948 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.338 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06948 (Same As) 2020-02-16 - signed chap.22