NY A08921 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - signed chap.324
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - signed chap.324
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the energy storage deployment policy.
Title
Establishes the energy storage deployment policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-05 | Senate | signed chap.324 |
2018-10-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.46 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7318A |
2018-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-06 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8921a |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-14 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2018-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.750 |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S07318 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8921A