NY A08920 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - substituted by s7301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - substituted by s7301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions amending the real property tax law relating to establishing an energy-related public utility mass real property central assessment pilot program; directs the commissioner of taxation and finance to submit a report relating to public utility mass real property.
Title
Repeals provisions amending the real property tax law relating to establishing an energy-related public utility mass real property central assessment pilot program; directs the commissioner of taxation and finance to submit a report relating to public utility mass real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | substituted by s7301 |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.802 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07301 (Same As) 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.315