NY A08895 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - signed chap.195
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - signed chap.195
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain lands to the city of New Rochelle until December 31, 2022.
Title
Extends the authority of the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain lands to the city of New Rochelle until December 31, 2022.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Assembly | signed chap.195 |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-03-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-31 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-03-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.738 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8266 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.478 |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | reported |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | print number 8895a |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08266 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8895A