NY A08888 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.343
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.343
Summary
Enacts the "child support modernization act".
Title
Enacts the "child support modernization act".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | signed chap.343 | |
2009-07-31 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.853 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3879A | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-22 | ordered to third reading rules cal.561 | |
2009-06-22 | rules report cal.561 | |
2009-06-22 | reported | |
2009-06-17 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-16 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-16 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-06-12 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03879 (Same As) 2009-08-11 - signed chap.343
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08888&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |