NY A08882 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to instituting internet service neutrality; provides the public service commission with jurisdiction over monitoring broadband internet service providers; requires a certification for internet service neutrality in certain state contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to instituting internet service neutrality; provides the public service commission with jurisdiction over monitoring broadband internet service providers; requires a certification for internet service neutrality in certain state contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-24Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.957
2018-05-22Assemblyreported
2018-04-17Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-03-21Assemblyprint number 8882c
2018-03-21Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2018-03-20Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-02-20Assemblyprint number 8882b
2018-02-20Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2018-01-29Assemblyprint number 8882a
2018-01-29Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2017-12-22Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S07183 (Same As) 2018-03-21 - PRINT NUMBER 7183C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08882&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08882&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08882
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08882&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08882A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08882&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08882B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08882&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08882C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08882&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08882&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08882&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08882&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback