NY A08877 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.107
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.107
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the city of Albany pilot residential parking system and extending the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to the city of Albany pilot residential parking system and extending the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | signed chap.107 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1696 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6683 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.176 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.176 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06683 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8877