NY A08842 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - substituted by s7733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - substituted by s7733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the awarding of attorney's fees under the human rights law; removes language relating to claims of credit discrimination where sex is a basis of such discrimination and claims of employment discrimination.
Title
Relates to the awarding of attorney's fees under the human rights law; removes language relating to claims of credit discrimination where sex is a basis of such discrimination and claims of employment discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | substituted by s7733 |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.372 |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07733 (Same As) 2022-03-18 - SIGNED CHAP.154