NY A08834 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Ramapo to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in the town of Ramapo, county of Rockland.
Title
Authorizes the town of Ramapo to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in the town of Ramapo, county of Rockland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.384 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.384 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07098 (Same As) 2012-04-27 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT