NY A08822 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to hunting in the county of Suffolk and the requirement that towns issue hunting permits.
Title
Relates to hunting in the county of Suffolk and the requirement that towns issue hunting permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.266 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.624 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6630B |
2014-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8822b |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8822a |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-09 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2014-05-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.707 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06630 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8822B