NY A08783 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the digital currency task force to provide the governor and the legislature with information on the potential effects of the widespread implementation of digital currencies on financial markets in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the digital currency task force to provide the governor and the legislature with information on the potential effects of the widespread implementation of digital currencies on financial markets in the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.2020
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S9013
2018-06-18SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-18Senatereturned to senate
2018-06-18Assemblyrepassed assembly
2018-06-14Assemblyamended on third reading 8783b
2018-06-14Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2018-06-14AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-14Senaterecalled from senate
2018-06-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.50
2018-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.50
2018-06-06Assemblyreported
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-07Assemblyprint number 8783a
2018-05-07Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to banks
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to banks
2017-11-27Assemblyreferred to banks

Same As/Similar To

S07724 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - REFERRED TO BANKS
S09013 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8783B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08783&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08783&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08783
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08783&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08783A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08783&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08783B
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08783&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08783&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08783&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08783&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8783#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback