NY A08767 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Adirondack road salt reduction task force, pilot plan and test program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Adirondack road salt reduction task force, pilot plan and test program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-22Senate3RD READING CAL.942
2020-07-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8663A
2020-07-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-20Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.184
2020-07-20Assemblyrules report cal.184
2020-07-20Assemblyreported
2020-07-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-16Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-07-10Assemblyprint number 8767a
2020-07-10Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-11-25Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S06824 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S08663 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8767A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08767&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08767&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08767
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08767&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08767A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08767&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08767&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08767&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08767&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8767#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback