NY A08750 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - substituted by s7801
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - substituted by s7801
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts shareholders of cooperative housing corporations from new provisions of law prohibiting legal fees in connection with the operation or rental of a residential unit.
Title
Exempts shareholders of cooperative housing corporations from new provisions of law prohibiting legal fees in connection with the operation or rental of a residential unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | substituted by s7801 |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.369 |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S07801 (Same As) 2022-03-18 - SIGNED CHAP.162