NY A08727 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - signed chap.21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - signed chap.21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions of law relating to the resale of tickets to places of entertainment through May 14, 2015.
Title
Extends certain provisions of law relating to the resale of tickets to places of entertainment through May 14, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-09 | Senate | signed chap.21 |
2014-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-05-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.434 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7012 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.542 |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | print number 8727a |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-02-05 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S07012 (Same As) 2014-05-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8727A