NY A08708 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing for multi-formatted service menus for the cognitively impaired on websites operated by certain state agencies; includes the department of health, office for people with developmental disabilities and the office of mental health.
Title
Relates to providing for multi-formatted service menus for the cognitively impaired on websites operated by certain state agencies; includes the department of health, office for people with developmental disabilities and the office of mental health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | print number 8708b |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | print number 8708a |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |