NY A08659 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - signed chap.47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - signed chap.47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions relating to physical therapy assistants.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions relating to physical therapy assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | signed chap.47 |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.438 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6666 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.508 |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06666 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8659