NY A08571 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - substituted by s8031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - substituted by s8031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the regulation of certain coated and treated seeds; requires the department of environmental conservation and the department of agriculture and markets to review the latest scientific information concerning certain pesticide active ingredients.
Title
Provides for the regulation of certain coated and treated seeds; requires the department of environmental conservation and the department of agriculture and markets to review the latest scientific information concerning certain pesticide active ingredients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Assembly | substituted by s8031 |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.317 |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-01-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08031 (Same As) 2024-03-22 - SIGNED CHAP.107