NY A08561 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.264
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.264
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of "immediate family".
Title
Relates to the definition of "immediate family".
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.264 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.341 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6419A |
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.165 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.165 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | print number 8561a |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06419 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8561A