NY A08555 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.124
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.124
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the occupancy tax in the city of New Rochelle until September 1, 2015.
Title
Extends the occupancy tax in the city of New Rochelle until September 1, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | signed chap.124 |
2012-07-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.857 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5903 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.416 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.416 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-10-21 | Assembly | print number 8555a |
2011-10-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2011-08-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05903 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8555A