NY A08552 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the commission on post-secondary correctional education.
Title
Establishes the commission on post-secondary correctional education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to correction | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-27 | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S5685 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE