NY A08551 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s7612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s7612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits India Pentecostal Assembly, Inc. to file an application for real property tax exemption for property owned at 310 South Oyster Bay Rd, Syosset.
Title
Permits India Pentecostal Assembly, Inc. to file an application for real property tax exemption for property owned at 310 South Oyster Bay Rd, Syosset.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s7612 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.326 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07612 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - SIGNED CHAP.657