NY A08531 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - signed chap.38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - signed chap.38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to emergency response plans relating to the notification of location of downed wires from a municipal emergency official and to plans to prioritize the securing of downed wires over routine maintenance or other work unrelated to a response to an emergency event.
Title
Relates to emergency response plans relating to the notification of location of downed wires from a municipal emergency official and to plans to prioritize the securing of downed wires over routine maintenance or other work unrelated to a response to an emergency event.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Assembly | signed chap.38 |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-01-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.34 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8034 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.247 |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08034 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8531