NY A08515 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - signed chap.31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - signed chap.31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state adult cystic fibrosis program which consists of administrative support services for the provision of financial assistance for services such as prescription drug costs, device costs, medical care services, behavioral health services, and insurance premiums for the treatment of cystic fibrosis disease and its conditions.
Title
Establishes the New York state adult cystic fibrosis program which consists of administrative support services for the provision of financial assistance for services such as prescription drug costs, device costs, medical care services, behavioral health services, and insurance premiums for the treatment of cystic fibrosis disease and its conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Assembly | signed chap.31 |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-01-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.11 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8002 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.5 |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.5 |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08002 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8515