NY A08510 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - substituted by s6236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - substituted by s6236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the payments of rebates on pari-mutuel wagers.
Title
Authorizes the payments of rebates on pari-mutuel wagers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6236 |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.426 |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S06236 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - SIGNED CHAP.11