NY A08501 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - print number 8501a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - print number 8501a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the division of homeland security and emergency services to work with other experts who maintain experience and knowledge in the area of cyber security to develop a cyber security action plan for New York state.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the division of homeland security and emergency services to work with other experts who maintain experience and knowledge in the area of cyber security to develop a cyber security action plan for New York state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Assembly | print number 8501a |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05946 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE