NY A08480 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - substituted by s6409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - substituted by s6409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period of time for which a municipality has the power to exclude indebtedness contracted for sewage facilities.
Title
Extends the period of time for which a municipality has the power to exclude indebtedness contracted for sewage facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Assembly | substituted by s6409 |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.615 |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06409 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.150