NY A08439 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state automatic identification technology privacy task force, to consist of: the superintendent of the department of financial services, the secretary of state, the commissioner of education, the director of the office for technology, the attorney general, the mayor of the city of New York and 11 at-large members to be appointed by the governor and the legislative leaders; the task force shall report to the governor and the legislature regarding: existing state law, regulations, programs, policies, and practices related to the use of automatic identification technology; the privacy issues associated with the use of automatic identification technology by public and private entities; research on privacy issues associated with the use of automatic identification technology; current and anticipated or possible future uses of automatic identification technology; the benefits to consumers and businesses from the use of automatic identification technology; and public awareness on the use of automatic identification technology.
Title
Establishes the New York state automatic identification technology privacy task force, to consist of: the superintendent of the department of financial services, the secretary of state, the commissioner of education, the director of the office for technology, the attorney general, the mayor of the city of New York and 11 at-large members to be appointed by the governor and the legislative leaders; the task force shall report to the governor and the legislature regarding: existing state law, regulations, programs, policies, and practices related to the use of automatic identification technology; the privacy issues associated with the use of automatic identification technology by public and private entities; research on privacy issues associated with the use of automatic identification technology; current and anticipated or possible future uses of automatic identification technology; the benefits to consumers and businesses from the use of automatic identification technology; and public awareness on the use of automatic identification technology.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Asm. William Boyland [D] | Asm. Herman Farrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07806 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES