NY A08403 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.98
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.98
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of education and the chancellor of the board of regents, with the approval of the board of regents, to appoint monitors to oversee the Hempstead union free school district.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of education and the chancellor of the board of regents, with the approval of the board of regents, to appoint monitors to oversee the Hempstead union free school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.98 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.753 |
2019-12-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.575 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8403 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1745 |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6559 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.575 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.575 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06559 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.98