NY A08396 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - substituted by s5620a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - substituted by s5620a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would add language to the penal law to make it explicit that a person is not criminally liable for possessing syringes and drug residue in or on syringes that the person has a right to possess based on his or her participation in the Public Health Law's Syringe Exchange Program (SEP) or Expanded Syringe Access Program (ESAP).
Title
Relates to hypodermic syringes and the lawful possession of such syringes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 32 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | substituted by s5620a | |
2010-02-22 | amended on third reading 8396a | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.586 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-15 | ordered to third reading rules cal.253 | |
2009-06-15 | rules report cal.253 | |
2009-06-15 | reported | |
2009-06-10 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-05-19 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S05620 (Same As) 2010-07-30 - SIGNED CHAP.284